The following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
of registration held by Dr. George Terence Riley, by order of the Discipline
Committee on July 19, 2006:
(a) Effective September 22, 2006, Dr. Riley shall restrict his practice
to surgical assisting, in accordance with an undertaking signed by
Dr. Riley;
(b) By September 30, 2006, Dr. Riley will provide confirmation to the
College, through his practice monitor, that as of that date, Dr.
Riley is in compliance with the Order of theDiscipline Committee
dated September 29, 2003, and is current and up-to-date on all of
his records, referrals, laboratory results and other correspondence
in his office and hospital practice.
The following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
of registration held by Dr. George Terence Riley, by order of the Discipline
Committee on September 29, 2003:
i) Dr. Riley will have a practice monitor for as long as he holds a
license to practice medicine. The practice monitor must be another
member of the College, approved of by the Registrar of the College
or his designate, and must meet with Dr. Riley a minimum of bi-
weekly to review all incoming relevant medical correspondence with
Dr. Riley and ensure timely follow-up on all such correspondence
including request for records, laboratory results, and
correspondence from the College. The monitor must also review Dr.
Riley's workload and give his consent in writing, a copy of which
is to be immediately forwarded to the College, prior to Dr. Riley
taking on any new patients. The practice monitor and Dr. Riley must
together provide a quarterly report to the Registrar of the College
or his designate as to the currency of Dr. Riley's records, the
timeliness of his referrals and his follow-up on laboratory results
and other correspondence.
ii) Dr. Riley will complete the College's records keeping course at his
own expense, by the end of 2003, including all optional components
of the course such as the follow-up review of his records and shall
provide proof of having done so to the Registrar of the College or
his designate on or before December 31, 2003.
iii) Dr. Riley will have his patient's file with him for each patient
evaluation or examination the he conducts and he will take
contemporary notes of each such evaluation or examination. Dr.
Riley will make specific note of any patient request for referral
in his records and will note any discussions regarding medical test
results discussed.
iv) Dr. Riley will initial and date all laboratory, ultra-sound and
other reports upon reviewing them.
v) Dr. Riley will continue psychotherapy with Dr. O'Sullivan or, in
the event Dr. O'Sullivan ceases to practice, with another
psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar of the College or his
designate. Dr. O'Sullivan, or the approved psychiatrist treating
Dr. Riley, will provide written confirmation of regular, bi-weekly,
attendance to the Registrar of the College or his designate every
six months. In the event that Dr. O'Sullivan or the approved
psychiatrist treating Dr. Riley determines that bi-weekly
attendance is unnecessary, the attendance schedule can be altered
on notice and with the approval of the Registrar of the College or
his designate.
vi) Dr. Riley will undergo an age related peer assessment within six
(6) months of the date of this order and again twelve (12) months
thereafter at the expense of the College.
vii) Dr. Riley will keep a sign posted at all times, in the form
attached hereto as Schedule 1, in all examination rooms used by him
for the purpose of seeing patients.
viii) Dr. Riley will complete a perinatal bereavement course offered by
Perinatal Bereavement Services of Ontario ("PBSO") either on
November 12 and 13, 2003 or at the next offering of the course
thereafter. If he is unable to attend the November, 2003 session,
Dr. Riley will contact the PBSO prior to November 12, 2003 and
inquire when the next course will be held and confirm that he is
registered. If the next course has not yet been scheduled at the
time of Dr. Riley's inquiry, Dr. Riley will continue with monthly
follow-ups with the PBSO and provide written notice of such follow-
ups to the Registrar of the College or his designate until such
time as he has registered for the perinatal bereavement course and
will provide evidence of having completed the course to the
Registrar of the College or his designate within two weeks of
having completed the course.
ix) Dr. Riley will forthwith execute an irrevocable consent to be filed
with the Registrar of the College that if allegations of a breach
of any of these terms, conditions or limitations is brought to the
attention of the Registrar, then the Registrar shall suspend Dr.
Riley's Certificate of Registration on seven (7) days notice to
him, with such suspension to remain in effect until such
allegations have been finally determined or disposed of by the
College through the complaints process and or discipline process
x) Dr. Riley shall pay three thousand seven hundred and fifty dollars
($3,750.00) for these proceedings within twelve (12) months time.