THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:17:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 19 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London X-Ray Associates
450 Central Avenue
London ON N6B 2E8
Date Received: 18 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Brandon Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Aug 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 19 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: London X-Ray Associates
450 Central Avenue
London ON N6B 2E8
Date Received: 18 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry Brandon Hobbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Aug 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1967

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1967