THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:34:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Apr 2018
Summary:
See PDF for the summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Peter North Watson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2018.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Nov 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Apr 2018
Summary:
See PDF for the summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Peter North Watson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2018.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Nov 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 May 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1967