THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:29:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request via fax to 905-934-9694. Patients seeking a copy of their medical record after June 30, 2022 should contact RSRS via telephone at 416-398-0638 and 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 10 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request via fax to 905-934-9694. Patients seeking a copy of their medical record after June 30, 2022 should contact RSRS via telephone at 416-398-0638 and 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 10 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Jul 2022
Summary:
As from June 30, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Carl Anthony Rhodes Fung in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
 
Concerns were expressed with respect to Dr. Fung’s family practice. As Dr. Fung was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Fung agreeing to resign from the College effective July 1, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Jul 2022
Summary:
As from June 30, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Carl Anthony Rhodes Fung in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
 
Concerns were expressed with respect to Dr. Fung’s family practice. As Dr. Fung was in the process of retiring, these concerns were resolved by Dr. Fung agreeing to resign from the College effective July 1, 2022 and agreeing never to reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1967