THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 16:19:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa, Ontario
L1H 1B9
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa, Ontario
L1H 1B9
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1967