THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 08:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 22 Dec 1995
Summary of Decision:
In December 1995, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Heath committed professional misconduct, and imposed a penalty.

On August 22, 1997, Dr. Heath's appeal to the Divisional Court was allowed and the Decision of the Discipline Committee was quashed.
 
 
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-08-22
Hearing Date(s): 23 Jan 1995

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 22 Dec 1995
Summary of Decision:
In December 1995, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Heath committed professional misconduct, and imposed a penalty.

On August 22, 1997, Dr. Heath's appeal to the Divisional Court was allowed and the Decision of the Discipline Committee was quashed.
 
 
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 1997-08-22
Hearing Date(s): 23 Jan 1995

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967


DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967