THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 19:58:45 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
1315 Finch Ave W
Suite 403
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 2G6

4515 Ebenezer
Unit 114
Brampton, Ontario
L6P 0B7

1525 Albion Rd # 100
Etobicoke, Ontario
M9V 5G5
Date Received: 31 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
1315 Finch Ave W
Suite 403
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 2G6

4515 Ebenezer
Unit 114
Brampton, Ontario
L6P 0B7

1525 Albion Rd # 100
Etobicoke, Ontario
M9V 5G5
Date Received: 31 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1963