THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:24:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. S.N. Chaudhry
Oshawa-Durham Sleep Laboratory
292 King St. W.
Oshawa, ON L1J2J9
who is the legal custodian of my patient records.
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Instructions/Address: Oshawa Durham Sleep Laboratory Clinic
292 King Street W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. S.N. Chaudhry
Oshawa-Durham Sleep Laboratory
292 King St. W.
Oshawa, ON L1J2J9
who is the legal custodian of my patient records.
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Instructions/Address: Oshawa Durham Sleep Laboratory Clinic
292 King Street W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1967

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1967