THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:08:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 142
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4480
Fax: (416) 340-5244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Cardella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 142
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4480
Fax: (416) 340-5244

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Cardella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARL JOSEPH CARDELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARL JOSEPH CARDELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967