THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 19 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 19 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967