THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:00:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Contact above
RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON
M3J 1Y6
email : [email protected]
Date Received: 01 Apr 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 05 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Contact above
RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON
M3J 1Y6
email : [email protected]
Date Received: 01 Apr 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Mar 2014
Summary of Decision:
On March 18, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Austin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of four patients in 2005 and 2006. Dr. Austin admitted the allegations.

Dr. Austin practised obstetrics and gynaecology. In April 2007, Dr. Austin agreed to terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration that restricted his obstetrical practice to office pre-natal care only, and required that his major gynaecological surgery and elective caesarean sections only be performed in the presence of another obstetrician/gynaecologist.

These terms were to remain in effect until May 26, 2007, after which he would cease such surgery completely and would independently perform only minor gynaecological surgery. In 2008, Dr. Austin resigned his membership with the College.

An independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Austin failed to maintain the standard of practice as follows:
In relation to Patient A, in 2005, in performing a laparoscopic procedure due to inappropriate patient selection. He displayed a lack of judgment in choosing to perform a laparoscopy for lysis of adhesions in a patient with numerous laparotomies and known adhesions.

He also failed to take into account, discuss and/or document the specific risk factors for complications that this patient had, including a failure to make full disclosure and/or document full disclosure following the patient's complication from surgery.

In relation to Patient B, in 2005, by not fully assessing the risk of malignancy of a simple ovarian cyst in a postmenopausal woman. He also did not clearly consider and/or document the risk of operative intervention as compared with conservative management.

In relation to Patient C, in 2006, in that he failed to adequately document his assessment of Patient C and failed to adequately document a description of the surgery he performed.

In relation to Patient D, in 2005, in that he did not comply with the College's Policy on Disclosure of Harm when he did not advise Patient D about a bowel perforation promptly after gynecological surgery, tell her how the complication was managed and advise her of any possible future consequences that might arise as a result of the complication.

The Committee ordered and directed that:
the Registrar revoke Dr. Austin's certificate of registration, effective immediately.

Dr. Austin appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

Dr. Austin pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): March 18, 2014

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Sep 2008
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Richard Conolly Austin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

(1) I, DR. RICHARD CONOLLY AUSTIN, having resigned my membership with the College as of June 1, 2008 hereby undertake not to re- apply to the College for a license or certificate to practise medicine in Ontario.

(2) I, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply to any College or regulatory authority for a license or certificate to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

(3) I, hereby agree that this document may be disclosed to any medical licensing body and may be posted on the College's register as information that is available to the public.

(4) I, acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College's Complaints Committee has agreed to take no further action with respect to the complaints currently before the Committee regarding my clinical care.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 18 Mar 2014
Summary of Decision:
On March 18, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Austin committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of four patients in 2005 and 2006. Dr. Austin admitted the allegations.

Dr. Austin practised obstetrics and gynaecology. In April 2007, Dr. Austin agreed to terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration that restricted his obstetrical practice to office pre-natal care only, and required that his major gynaecological surgery and elective caesarean sections only be performed in the presence of another obstetrician/gynaecologist.

These terms were to remain in effect until May 26, 2007, after which he would cease such surgery completely and would independently perform only minor gynaecological surgery. In 2008, Dr. Austin resigned his membership with the College.

An independent expert retained by the College opined that Dr. Austin failed to maintain the standard of practice as follows:
In relation to Patient A, in 2005, in performing a laparoscopic procedure due to inappropriate patient selection. He displayed a lack of judgment in choosing to perform a laparoscopy for lysis of adhesions in a patient with numerous laparotomies and known adhesions.

He also failed to take into account, discuss and/or document the specific risk factors for complications that this patient had, including a failure to make full disclosure and/or document full disclosure following the patient's complication from surgery.

In relation to Patient B, in 2005, by not fully assessing the risk of malignancy of a simple ovarian cyst in a postmenopausal woman. He also did not clearly consider and/or document the risk of operative intervention as compared with conservative management.

In relation to Patient C, in 2006, in that he failed to adequately document his assessment of Patient C and failed to adequately document a description of the surgery he performed.

In relation to Patient D, in 2005, in that he did not comply with the College's Policy on Disclosure of Harm when he did not advise Patient D about a bowel perforation promptly after gynecological surgery, tell her how the complication was managed and advise her of any possible future consequences that might arise as a result of the complication.

The Committee ordered and directed that:
the Registrar revoke Dr. Austin's certificate of registration, effective immediately.

Dr. Austin appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

Dr. Austin pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): March 18, 2014

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 22 Sep 2008
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Richard Conolly Austin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

(1) I, DR. RICHARD CONOLLY AUSTIN, having resigned my membership with the College as of June 1, 2008 hereby undertake not to re- apply to the College for a license or certificate to practise medicine in Ontario.

(2) I, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply to any College or regulatory authority for a license or certificate to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

(3) I, hereby agree that this document may be disclosed to any medical licensing body and may be posted on the College's register as information that is available to the public.

(4) I, acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College's Complaints Committee has agreed to take no further action with respect to the complaints currently before the Committee regarding my clinical care.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 18 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967