THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Mar 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3

Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Mar 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3

Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: (647) 933 2904
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 20 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967