THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:44:25 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, IRANIAN, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, IRANIAN, PERSIAN
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Mar 2011
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Firouz Khamsi, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Firouz Khamsi:

(1) Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
(2) Hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(3) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
(4) Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated April 7, 2010, that I committed an act of professional misconduct. In particular, it is alleged that I am incompetent as defined by subsection 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code and that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in my care, treatment and record-keeping for twenty-six patients, the identities of whom have been disclosed to me.
(5) Agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the investigation and prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 4.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Mar 2011
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Firouz Khamsi, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Firouz Khamsi:

(1) Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
(2) Hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(3) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
(4) Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated April 7, 2010, that I committed an act of professional misconduct. In particular, it is alleged that I am incompetent as defined by subsection 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code and that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in my care, treatment and record-keeping for twenty-six patients, the identities of whom have been disclosed to me.
(5) Agree that, in the event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the investigation and prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 4.

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 07 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 07 May 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 1971

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1968

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1968