THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:05:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 03 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 11 Shepherds Cir
St Catharines, ON L2T 2C8
Date Received: 08 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 03 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 11 Shepherds Cir
St Catharines, ON L2T 2C8
Date Received: 08 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Mar 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1971

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1968