THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Apr 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jacques Laforest to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 6, 2017:

Dr. Laforest was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Laforest is resigning from the College effective June 30, 2017 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Apr 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jacques Laforest to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 6, 2017:

Dr. Laforest was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Laforest is resigning from the College effective June 30, 2017 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1968