THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 07:02:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 05 Mar 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 05 Mar 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 May 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1965
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2015


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 1974

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1972

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 May 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1965