THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 04:11:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:

Dr. W.M. Cheung
Fax: 905-764-1307
Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:

PO Box 87674
298 John Street
Thornhill, ON
L3T 7R4
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:

390 Highlen Avenue
Markham, ON
L3S 4J3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact:

Dr. W.M. Cheung
Fax: 905-764-1307

Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:

Dr. W.M. Cheung
Fax: 905-764-1307
Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:

PO Box 87674
298 John Street
Thornhill, ON
L3T 7R4
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to:

390 Highlen Avenue
Markham, ON
L3S 4J3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Instructions/Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact:

Dr. W.M. Cheung
Fax: 905-764-1307

Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2013


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1969

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 1969