THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Records up to 2011:
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 888 563 3732

Records from 2012-2016:
Albionthistle Town Medical Centre
Suite A2
900 Albion Road
Toronto, ON M9V 1A5
Tel: 416 740 7272
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Records up to 2011:
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 888 563 3732

Records from 2012-2016:
Albionthistle Town Medical Centre
Suite A2
900 Albion Road
Toronto, ON M9V 1A5
Tel: 416 740 7272
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 1969