THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 21:11:36 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968