THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:01:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Asselstine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Asselstine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 Nov 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Asselstine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 9, 2021:

Dr. Asselstine has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Nov 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 Nov 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Asselstine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 9, 2021:

Dr. Asselstine has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 04 Nov 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 13 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 29 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Quality Assurance Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1971

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968