THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:19:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient files will be stored at the following location on or before February 28, 2023

Record Storage and Retrieval Services (RSRS)
111 St. Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6

Telephone: (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 21 Feb 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian W. Hands Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patient files will be stored at the following location on or before February 28, 2023

Record Storage and Retrieval Services (RSRS)
111 St. Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6

Telephone: (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 21 Feb 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian W. Hands Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968