THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:55:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York ON M6B 3Z4
1-888-781-9083
Fax:1-866-297-9338
[email protected]
Date Received: 18 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. L. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DOCUdavit Solutions
28 Eugene St
North York ON M6B 3Z4
1-888-781-9083
Fax:1-866-297-9338
[email protected]
Date Received: 18 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. L. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1968