THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:19:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 05 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 Dec 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel G. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 05 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 Dec 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel G. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968