THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 01:04:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lucknow, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1861 Rideau Garden Drive
Ottawa, ON K1S 1G5
Date Received: 01 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Lucknow, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1861 Rideau Garden Drive
Ottawa, ON K1S 1G5
Date Received: 01 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lucknow, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1969

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1968

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1966

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1965

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1964