THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 23:41:46 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Command Services Record Management Ltd.
100 Piccadilly Street
London ON N6A 1R8
Tel: (519) 672-1460
Date Received: 08 Sep 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Stoffman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Command Services Record Management Ltd.
100 Piccadilly Street
London ON N6A 1R8
Tel: (519) 672-1460
Date Received: 08 Sep 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Stoffman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968