THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:18:02 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Morison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jun 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Morison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jun 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 1972

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1969

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 1969