THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:21:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Jason Dodge
6th Floor
Room 601
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 18 Aug 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Jason Dodge
6th Floor
Room 601
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 18 Aug 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1967
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1964
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1969

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1967

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1964