THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:52:45 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1969

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968