THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:20:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian D. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian D. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 1975

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1969