THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 07:22:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1959
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record should contact the office they attended:

Hakim London King County of Middlesex
217 King St
London ON N6A 1C9
Tel: 519-439-0277
Fax: 519-439-0279

or

Secondary Peaker Optical County of Middlesex
1984 Dundas St E
London ON N5V 1P5
Tel: 519-451-5417
Fax: 519-451-0644
Date Received: 16 Sep 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1968
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1968
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record should contact the office they attended:

Hakim London King County of Middlesex
217 King St
London ON N6A 1C9
Tel: 519-439-0277
Fax: 519-439-0279

or

Secondary Peaker Optical County of Middlesex
1984 Dundas St E
London ON N5V 1P5
Tel: 519-451-5417
Fax: 519-451-0644
Date Received: 16 Sep 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1959

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2019


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1968