THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:30:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1960
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Sep 2008
Summary of Decision:
On September 8, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Handscomb to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1) that Dr. Handscomb appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.

2) That Dr. Handscombe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by October 8, 2008.

3) Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2008

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Sep 2008
Summary of Decision:
On September 8, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Handscomb to have committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1) that Dr. Handscomb appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.

2) That Dr. Handscombe pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 by October 8, 2008.

3) Directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2008

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1960

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1969