THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 23 Apr 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1273 Stoney Island RdClark's Harbour, NS B0W 1P0
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 23 Apr 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1273 Stoney Island RdClark's Harbour, NS B0W 1P0
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Nov 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Nov 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 1969

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968