THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may contact the above address to obtain a copy of their medical records.
Archdekin Medical Group
205 Hiram St
Bracebridge, ON P1L 2C1
Tel: 705-645-2223
Fax: 705-645-5286
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kent Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may contact the above address to obtain a copy of their medical records.
Archdekin Medical Group
205 Hiram St
Bracebridge, ON P1L 2C1
Tel: 705-645-2223
Fax: 705-645-5286
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kent Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1969

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 1969