THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:33:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Villa Marconi
1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 727-6201
Fax: (613) 727-9352
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1974
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Villa Marconi
1026 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2C 0A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 727-6201
Fax: (613) 727-9352
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1974
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIDACUS SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIDACUS SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1967
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 1967