THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1964
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Sep 2003
Summary of Decision:
On December 1, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Gerald Dixon Smith committed acts of professional misconduct including sexual impropriety with a patient, failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee directed that Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration be revoked immediately, effective January 20, 2004. On January 21, 2004, Dr. Smith appealed to the Divisional Court. Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedures Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.

On March 13, 2006, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Smith(s appeal.

Therefore, Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario is revoked effective March 13, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2006-03-13
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 2002

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Sep 2003
Summary of Decision:
On December 1, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Gerald Dixon Smith committed acts of professional misconduct including sexual impropriety with a patient, failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee directed that Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration be revoked immediately, effective January 20, 2004. On January 21, 2004, Dr. Smith appealed to the Divisional Court. Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedures Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.

On March 13, 2006, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Smith(s appeal.

Therefore, Dr. Smith(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario is revoked effective March 13, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2006-03-13
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 2002

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1964

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Mar 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1970
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1970