THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:44:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2888 Bathurst Street
2nd floor
Toronto Ontario M6B 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166332244
Fax: 4166339254

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 11 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2888 Bathurst Street
2nd floor
Toronto Ontario M6B 4H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166332244
Fax: 4166339254

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 11 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
02 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from December 4, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alvin Pettle, in
accordance with an undertaking provided by Dr. Pettle to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing privileges with respect to
Narcotic drugs and Narcotic preparations as set out in Schedules I
through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19,
and summarized as follows:


Drugs/Substances Relinquished

Narcotic Drugs yes
Narcotic Preparations yes
Controlled Drugs no
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances no

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from December 4, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alvin Pettle, in
accordance with an undertaking provided by Dr. Pettle to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing privileges with respect to
Narcotic drugs and Narcotic preparations as set out in Schedules I
through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19,
and summarized as follows:


Drugs/Substances Relinquished

Narcotic Drugs yes
Narcotic Preparations yes
Controlled Drugs no
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances no

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 02 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 20 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 10 Feb 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1969