THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 10:55:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Durham, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Dec 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Manwel Bedessee
PO Box 48009
Kitchener, Ontario
N2E 4K6
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Mrs. Daphne Bedessee
Tel: 519-696-3993
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Durham, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Dec 1971
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1971
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Manwel Bedessee
PO Box 48009
Kitchener, Ontario
N2E 4K6
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Mrs. Daphne Bedessee
Tel: 519-696-3993
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Durham, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1969