THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:19:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1973
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1973
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 13 Apr 2022
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Charles George Duncan was found guilty of the following offence(s):
1. Sexual Assault, on or about September 25, 2016, at the Town of Pelham, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Sexual Assault, on or about November 27, 2000, at the Town of Pelham, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Sexual Assault, between January 1, 1999 and October 31, 1999, at the Town of Pelham,
contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4. Sexual Assault, between September 1, 2018 and September 30, 2018, at the Town of Pelham,
contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
5. Sexual Assault, on or about June 23, 2009, at the City of St. Catharines, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
6. Sexual Assault, on or about June 30, 2009, at the City of St. Catharines, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: January 21, 2022
SENTENCE: June 3, 2022
1. 15 months’ imprisonment.
2. 3 years probation (with conditions).
3. DNA Order.
4. Order to Comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for life.
Probation Conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and
promptly notify the court or the probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4. Report in either person or by Telephone to a probation officer within 2 (two) working days and
after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer or any person authorized
by a probation officer to assist in your supervision.
5. Cooperate with your probation officer. You must sign any releases necessary to permit the
probation officer to monitor your compliance and you must provide proof of compliance with
any condition of this Order to your probation officer on request.
6. Do not contact or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
7. Do not be within 100 metres of any place where you know named persons to live, work, go to
school, frequent or any place you know named persons to be EXCEPT for required court
attendances.
8. Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as
directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer.
9. You shall sign any release of information forms as will enable your probation officer to
monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative
programs as directed.
10. You shall provide proof of your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling
or rehabilitative programs as directed


Source: Member
Effective Date: 22 Aug 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles George Duncan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 22, 2019:

College Investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Duncan engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. In the face of these Investigations, Dr. Duncan resigned from the College, effective October 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 13 Apr 2022
Summary:
Findings of Guilt
Charles George Duncan was found guilty of the following offence(s):
1. Sexual Assault, on or about September 25, 2016, at the Town of Pelham, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Sexual Assault, on or about November 27, 2000, at the Town of Pelham, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Sexual Assault, between January 1, 1999 and October 31, 1999, at the Town of Pelham,
contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4. Sexual Assault, between September 1, 2018 and September 30, 2018, at the Town of Pelham,
contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
5. Sexual Assault, on or about June 23, 2009, at the City of St. Catharines, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
6. Sexual Assault, on or about June 30, 2009, at the City of St. Catharines, contrary to Section
271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date: January 21, 2022
SENTENCE: June 3, 2022
1. 15 months’ imprisonment.
2. 3 years probation (with conditions).
3. DNA Order.
4. Order to Comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for life.
Probation Conditions:
1. Keep the peace and be of good behaviour.
2. Appear before the court when required to do so by the court.
3. Notify the court or the probation officer in advance of any change of name or address and
promptly notify the court or the probation officer of any change in employment or occupation.
4. Report in either person or by Telephone to a probation officer within 2 (two) working days and
after that, at all times and places as directed by the probation officer or any person authorized
by a probation officer to assist in your supervision.
5. Cooperate with your probation officer. You must sign any releases necessary to permit the
probation officer to monitor your compliance and you must provide proof of compliance with
any condition of this Order to your probation officer on request.
6. Do not contact or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
7. Do not be within 100 metres of any place where you know named persons to live, work, go to
school, frequent or any place you know named persons to be EXCEPT for required court
attendances.
8. Attend and actively participate in all assessment, counselling or rehabilitative programs as
directed by the probation officer and complete them to the satisfaction of the probation officer.
9. You shall sign any release of information forms as will enable your probation officer to
monitor your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling or rehabilitative
programs as directed.
10. You shall provide proof of your attendance and completion of any assessments, counselling
or rehabilitative programs as directed


Source: Member
Effective Date: 22 Aug 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles George Duncan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 22, 2019:

College Investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Duncan engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. In the face of these Investigations, Dr. Duncan resigned from the College, effective October 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1969