THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:56:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical Records
Toronto General Hospital
Tel: 416-340-4800 Ext: 3416
Fax: 416-340-3829
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Menashe B. Waxman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical Records
Toronto General Hospital
Tel: 416-340-4800 Ext: 3416
Fax: 416-340-3829
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Menashe B. Waxman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1970