THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:57:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 Mar 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward H. Flowers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 Mar 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward H. Flowers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2012

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 Feb 2012
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Edward Henry Flowers to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: this is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Edward H. Flowers:

(2) Acknowledge that I have given several Undertakings to the College, including on November 19, 2008, January 22, 2009 and March 17, 2010 (the “Previous Undertakings”).
(3) Hereby resign from the College effective immediately upon execution of this Undertaking.
(4) Understand and agree that upon execution of this Undertaking, this Undertaking shall replace all Previous Undertakings given to the College and that the Previous Undertakings will no longer be of any force or effect.
(5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise.
(12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 03 Feb 2012
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Edward Henry Flowers to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: this is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Edward H. Flowers:

(2) Acknowledge that I have given several Undertakings to the College, including on November 19, 2008, January 22, 2009 and March 17, 2010 (the “Previous Undertakings”).
(3) Hereby resign from the College effective immediately upon execution of this Undertaking.
(4) Understand and agree that upon execution of this Undertaking, this Undertaking shall replace all Previous Undertakings given to the College and that the Previous Undertakings will no longer be of any force or effect.
(5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise.
(12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 May 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1970