THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1966
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should first call Records Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732 to inquire if they have the medical record. If they do not have the medical record, then a written request can be sent to Dr. Shaghayegh Rezaie at Unit 212, 840 Coxwell Avenue, Toronto ON M4C 5T2.
Date Received: 22 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should first call Records Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732 to inquire if they have the medical record. If they do not have the medical record, then a written request can be sent to Dr. Shaghayegh Rezaie at Unit 212, 840 Coxwell Avenue, Toronto ON M4C 5T2.
Date Received: 22 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2019


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968