THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405-1 Benvenuto Place
Toronto Ontario M4V 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 618 9224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 23 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405-1 Benvenuto Place
Toronto Ontario M4V 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 618 9224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 23 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH MARILYN ASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH MARILYN ASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1969