THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ministry of Labour, Chest clinic, Occupational Health and Safty Branch, Suite 1300, 123 Edward Street, Toronto, ON, M5G 1E2
Date Received: 18 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ministry of Labour, Chest clinic, Occupational Health and Safty Branch, Suite 1300, 123 Edward Street, Toronto, ON, M5G 1E2
Date Received: 18 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 1970