THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350 Lonsdale Rd
Apt #514
Toronto ON M5P 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 483-2685
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Richview Road
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
Toronto Ontario M9A 5E4
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350 Lonsdale Rd
Apt #514
Toronto ON M5P 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 483-2685
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Richview Road
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
Toronto Ontario M9A 5E4
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER HACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER HACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1970
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 1970