THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:11:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 27, 2016 at the Ontario Superior Court in London, Ontario, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Michael O'Mahony in respect of an incident that took place in August 2007.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On July 27, 2016 at the Ontario Superior Court in London, Ontario, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Michael O'Mahony in respect of an incident that took place in August 2007.

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 1969