THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:42:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Forget may contact Natalie Hodgins at:

Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 25 Aug 2023

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Forget may contact Natalie Hodgins at:

Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 25 Aug 2023

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Oct 1990
Summary of Decision:
In October 1990, Dr. Forget pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Forget guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Forget was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;

2. Dr. Forget was to complete the evaluation of his ability to practice medical orthopaedics in a manner safe to the public, as ordered by the Corporation professionnelle des médicins du Québec;

3. Dr. Forget was to provide to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario written authorization to obtain from the Corporation professionnelle des médicins du Québec particulars of the evaluation made of his ability to practice medical orthopaedics in a manner safe to the public, all recommendations made respecting a program of improvement, and copies of any reports prepared for the Corporation following such an evaluation. It was further ordered that, should Dr. Forget fail to meet these requirements by 1 February 1991, then his licence to practice medicine in Ontario would be suspended for six months; and

4. A restriction was to be placed on Dr. Forget's licence, permanently prohibiting him from practicing surgery in the Province of Ontario.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Oct 1990

Other Notifications (5)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Forget to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 12, 2019:

Dr. Forget was the subject of College investigations into his orthopedic practice. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Forget will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 8 months.

Dr. Forget will engage in professional education including in medical record-keeping, intra-articular injections and consent to treatment.

Dr. Forget’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Feb 2016
Summary:
Dr. Forget has completed all components of his SCERP.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Oct 1990
Summary of Decision:
In October 1990, Dr. Forget pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Forget guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1. Dr. Forget was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;

2. Dr. Forget was to complete the evaluation of his ability to practice medical orthopaedics in a manner safe to the public, as ordered by the Corporation professionnelle des médicins du Québec;

3. Dr. Forget was to provide to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario written authorization to obtain from the Corporation professionnelle des médicins du Québec particulars of the evaluation made of his ability to practice medical orthopaedics in a manner safe to the public, all recommendations made respecting a program of improvement, and copies of any reports prepared for the Corporation following such an evaluation. It was further ordered that, should Dr. Forget fail to meet these requirements by 1 February 1991, then his licence to practice medicine in Ontario would be suspended for six months; and

4. A restriction was to be placed on Dr. Forget's licence, permanently prohibiting him from practicing surgery in the Province of Ontario.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 10 Oct 1990

Other Notifications (5)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Forget to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 12, 2019:

Dr. Forget was the subject of College investigations into his orthopedic practice. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Forget will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 8 months.

Dr. Forget will engage in professional education including in medical record-keeping, intra-articular injections and consent to treatment.

Dr. Forget’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 02 Feb 2016
Summary:
Dr. Forget has completed all components of his SCERP.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 1989
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 1989

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1967