THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:07:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Mar 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 10 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
197 Belmoral Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 5P9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Jefferies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Mar 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 10 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
197 Belmoral Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 5P9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Jefferies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1971

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970