THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:42:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Dec 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Valentine Harry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 4, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harry engaged in professional misconduct and is incompetent in his general medicine practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Harry has agreed to resign from the College, effective December 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Dec 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Philip Valentine Harry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 4, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harry engaged in professional misconduct and is incompetent in his general medicine practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Harry has agreed to resign from the College, effective December 31, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Apr 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 1980

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 1969