THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:47:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1960
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2817 Riverside Dr
Riverview Medical Clinic
Ottawa ON K1V 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2817 Riverside Dr
Riverview Medical Clinic
Ottawa ON K1V 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
19 Nov 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 19 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from November 19, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Harsha Venilal
Dehejia, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dehejia to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Dehejia may not engage in the practice of any testing for food and
drug allergies and in any treatment of patients for food and drug
allergies apart from appropriate interventions for acute emergency
allergic reactions (anaphylaxis) effective immediately.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from November 19, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Harsha Venilal
Dehejia, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dehejia to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Dehejia may not engage in the practice of any testing for food and
drug allergies and in any treatment of patients for food and drug
allergies apart from appropriate interventions for acute emergency
allergic reactions (anaphylaxis) effective immediately.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1960

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1970
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1970