THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:19:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1972
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Group Health Centre
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugene Turgeon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1972
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Group Health Centre
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugene Turgeon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970